California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 12, 2010
Bill June 15, 2010
Bill May 11, 2010
Bill April 21, 2010