California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1354 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 19, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 22, 2010
Bill June 1, 2010
Bill April 21, 2010