LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1354
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1354
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1354
Compare Versions
SB1354 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB1354 Enrolled August 30, 2010
SB1354 Amended August 19, 2010
SB1354 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1354 Amended June 22, 2010
SB1354 Amended June 1, 2010
SB1354 Amended April 21, 2010
SB1354 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1354 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB1354 Enrolled August 30, 2010
SB1354 Amended August 19, 2010
SB1354 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1354 Amended June 22, 2010
SB1354 Amended June 1, 2010
SB1354 Amended April 21, 2010
SB1354 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare