04/27/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3162.) | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
04/01/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |