California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1359 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/26/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1359AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 26, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 8, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Price FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add and repeal Section 18919 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1359, as amended, Price. Public social services. Existing law provides for various federal human services programs, including the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP), under which food stamps are allocated to the state by the federal government and are distributed to eligible households by each county through the state's Food Stamp program. This bill would require the California Research Bureau of the California State Library  to  , no later than July 1, 2011,  to  compile all existing information and recommendations from interested stakeholders relating to, among other things, increasing participation in federal human services programs, including the federal SNAP program. This bill would require the Legislative Analyst's  Office to submit,   Office, no later than November 1, 2011,  and no later than November 1 of each year thereafter for 4 years,   to submit  a report to the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature, analyzing and evaluating participation in federal human services programs, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18919 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 18919. (a) (1) The California Research Bureau (CRB) of the California State Library shall compile all existing information and recommendations from interested stakeholders relating to the issues the Legislative Analyst's Office (LAO) is required to report on as specified in paragraphs (1) to (3), inclusive, of subdivision (b). (2) The CRB shall submit a report of its findings and the recommendations gathered pursuant to paragraph (1) to the LAO no later than July 1, 2011.  (b) The LAO shall, no later than November 1, 2011, and no later than November 1 of each year thereafter, submit a report to   (b)     No later than November 1, 2011, the LAO shall submit a report to  the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature addressing all of the following using the information and recommendations submitted by the CRB pursuant to subdivision (a): (1) Analysis of the economic and social impact of the recommendations of interested stakeholders relating to the removal of  administrative  barriers to  increase   increased  participation in the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. (2) Evaluation of the best practices and  administrative housekeeping  policies of the State Department of Social Services with respect to encouraging participation in the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program and maximizing participation in all federal human services programs  as policy changes occur  . (3) Analysis of the economic impacts regionally within the state of increased participation in federal human services programs. (c) (1) A report to be submitted pursuant to subdivision (b) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on November 1, 2015.