07/15/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/15/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/06/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
06/28/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. (Enrolled measure version corrected June 30.) | |||
06/28/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5843.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |||
05/20/2010 | To Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/29/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3379.) To Assembly. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3296.) | |||
04/09/2010 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
04/08/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |