California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1382 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/15/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1382CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 113 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 15, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 15, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 29, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 28, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 5, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Veterans Affairs (Senators Denham (Chair), Cedillo, Correa, Maldonado, Negrete McLeod, Wiggins, and Wyland) FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 69432.9 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1382, Committee on Veterans Affairs. Student financial aid: Cal Grant Program: methodology. Existing law, the Ortiz-Pacheco-Poochigian-Vasconcellos Cal Grant Program, establishes the Cal Grant A and B Entitlement Awards, the California Community College Transfer Cal Grant Entitlement Awards, the Competitive Cal Grant A and B Awards, the Cal Grant C Awards, and the Cal Grant T Awards under the administration of the Student Aid Commission, and establishes eligibility requirements for awards under these programs for participating students attending qualifying institutions. The program specifies the minimum financial need required for the receipt of Cal Grant awards and requires, for purposes of determining financial need, that financial need to be calculated consistent with the commission's methodology for financial need for the 2000-01 academic year. This bill would delete the requirement that the calculation of financial need be consistent with that methodology and would make other technical, nonsubstantive changes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 69432.9 of the Education Code is amended to read: 69432.9. (a) A Cal Grant applicant shall submit a complete official financial aid application pursuant to Section 69433 and applicable regulations adopted by the commission. (b) Financial need shall be determined using the federal financial need methodology pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 69506 and applicable regulations adopted by the commission, and as established by Title IV of the federal Higher Education Act of 1965, as amended (20 U.S.C. Secs. 1070 et seq.). (1) "Expected family contribution," with respect to an applicant shall be determined using the federal methodology pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 69506 (as established by Title IV of the federal Higher Education Act of 1965, as amended (20 U.S.C. Secs. 1070 et seq.)) and applicable rules and regulations adopted by the commission. (2) "Financial need" means the difference between the student's cost of attendance as determined by the commission and the expected family contribution. The calculation of financial need shall be consistent with Title IV of the federal Higher Education Act of 1965, as amended (20 U.S.C. Secs. 1070 et seq.). (3) (A) The minimum financial need required for receipt of an initial Cal Grant A or Cal Grant C award shall be no less than the maximum annual award value for the applicable institution, plus an additional one thousand five hundred dollars ($1,500) of financial need. (B) The minimum financial need required for receipt of an initial Cal Grant B award shall be no less than seven hundred dollars ($700). (c) The commission shall require that a grade point average be submitted for all Cal Grant A and B applicants, except for those permitted to provide test scores in lieu of a grade point average. The commission shall require that each report of a grade point average include a certification, executed under penalty of perjury, by a school official, that the grade point average reported is accurately reported. The certification shall include a statement that it is subject to review by the commission or its designee. The commission shall adopt regulations that establish a grace period for receipt of the grade point average and any appropriate corrections, and that set forth the circumstances under which a student may submit a specified test score designated by the commission, by regulation, in lieu of submitting a qualifying grade point average. It is the intent of the Legislature that high schools and institutions of higher education certify the grade point averages of their students in time to meet the application deadlines imposed by this chapter.