|
08/31/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 5056.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 5131.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6830.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 23.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. On TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6324.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 14.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3414.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3104.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|