LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1394
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1394
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1394
Compare Versions
SB1394 Amended August 25, 2010
SB1394 Amended August 18, 2010
SB1394 Amended April 13, 2010
SB1394 Amended March 24, 2010
SB1394 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1394 Amended August 25, 2010
SB1394 Amended August 18, 2010
SB1394 Amended April 13, 2010
SB1394 Amended March 24, 2010
SB1394 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare