|
09/02/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 217, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4944.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6263.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3697.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3304.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3186.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|