California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1395 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 2, 2010

Amended

Bill June 30, 2010
Bill June 14, 2010
Bill May 12, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010