|
09/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 405, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 5068.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 32. Page 6837.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6427.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3741.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3548.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3310.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|