California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1399 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 23, 2010
Bill May 20, 2010
Bill May 11, 2010
Bill April 14, 2010
Bill April 7, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010