|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 558, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 4972.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 6743.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3727.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3675.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3184.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|