California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 22, 2010
Bill June 1, 2010