|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4930.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 6670.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6426.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3731.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3675.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3298.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|