LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1414
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1414
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1414
Compare Versions
SB1414 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB1414 Amended August 20, 2010
SB1414 Amended August 17, 2010
SB1414 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1414 Amended June 22, 2010
SB1414 Amended June 1, 2010
SB1414 Amended April 27, 2010
SB1414 Amended April 13, 2010
SB1414 Amended March 25, 2010
SB1414 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1414 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB1414 Amended August 20, 2010
SB1414 Amended August 17, 2010
SB1414 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1414 Amended June 22, 2010
SB1414 Amended June 1, 2010
SB1414 Amended April 27, 2010
SB1414 Amended April 13, 2010
SB1414 Amended March 25, 2010
SB1414 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare