08/25/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/25/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
08/13/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
08/10/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/09/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 12. Page 6102.) To Senate. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/01/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 30.) | |||
05/28/2010 | To Com. on ED. | |||
05/10/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/10/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 4. Page 3477.) To Assembly. | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3443.) | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 5. | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/19/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/11/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |