California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1422 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/25/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1422CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 186 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 25, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 25, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 10, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 9, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 19, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Romero FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 52760) to Chapter 11 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to teachers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1422, Romero. Teachers: pupil survey. Existing law requires the governing board of each school district to evaluate and assess certificated employee performance as it reasonably relates to the progress of pupils toward the standards of expected pupil achievement and the state adopted academic content standards, the instructional techniques and strategies used by the employee, the employee's adherence to curricular objectives, and the establishment and maintenance of a suitable learning environment. This bill would authorize the student government of a school maintaining any of grades 9 to 12, inclusive, to establish a committee of pupils and teachers to develop a survey by which pupils may provide feedback to teachers. The survey would be required to solicit pupil opinion on different aspects of a class and the effectiveness of the teacher of the class. The survey would be provided annually to teachers who would survey the pupils in the classes they teach. Survey responses would be confidential and made known only to the teacher whose class is surveyed. Administrators and school or district officials would be prohibited from viewing or having access to any completed pupil survey without the express written consent of the teacher to whom the survey relates. The surveys would be prohibited from becoming part of a teacher's personnel record, from being included in or used to influence the existing teacher evaluation process, and from being used for collective bargaining purposes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 5 (commencing with Section 52760) is added to Chapter 11 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, to read: Article 5. Pupil Survey of Instruction 52760. (a) The student government of a school maintaining any of grades 9 to 12, inclusive, may establish a committee of pupils and teachers to develop a survey by which pupils may provide feedback to teachers for the purpose of fostering improved communication between pupils and teachers and improving individual classes and teaching methods for future generations of pupils. The survey developed by the committee shall solicit pupil opinion on different aspects of a class and the effectiveness of the teacher of the class. The committee annually may revise the survey. (b) The administration of the survey and the survey results shall conform to all of the following requirements: (1) Teachers annually shall be provided the survey and may survey the pupils in the classes they teach. (2) Survey responses shall be confidential and shall be made known only to the teacher whose class is surveyed. (3) No administrator or any other school or district official shall view or have access to any survey responses without the express written consent of the teacher to whom the survey relates. (4) Survey responses shall not become part of a teacher's personnel record. (5) The survey and any responses shall not be used for collective bargaining purposes. (6) The survey responses shall not be included in, nor shall they be used to influence the existing teacher evaluation process, if any, in a school or district in which the survey is conducted.