|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4947.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4742.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4627.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6324.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 14.)
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Coms. on U. & C. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3414.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3082.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|