California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1437 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/31/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1437ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 26, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 7, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 13, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 351 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1437, Kehoe. Electricity: Independent System Operator: activities report. The existing restructuring of the electrical industry within the Public Utilities Act provides for the establishment of an Independent System Operator (ISO) as a public benefit corporation, with a 5-member independent governing board of directors appointed by the Governor and subject to confirmation by the Senate. Existing law requires the ISO to ensure efficient use and reliable operation of the transmission grid consistent with achieving planning and operating reserve criteria no less stringent than those established by the Western Electricity Coordinating Council and the North American Electric Reliability Council. This bill would require the independent governing board of directors to annually select a representative of the ISO to appear before the appropriate policy committees of the Senate and Assembly to report on the activities of the ISO. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 351 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 351. (a) The independent governing board of directors shall annually select a representative of the Independent System Operator to appear before the appropriate policy committees of the Senate and Assembly to report on the activities of the Independent System Operator, including, but not limited to, those matters described in subdivision (b). (b) The representative of the Independent System Operator selected by the independent governing board of directors pursuant to subdivision (a), shall annually report on each of the following: (1) A summary of those actions undertaken by the Independent System Operator during the prior year to ensure the reliability of electric service and the health and safety of the public by managing the transmission system and related energy markets consistent with the requirements of subdivision (b) of Section 345.5. (2) A summary of those actions undertaken by the Independent System Operator during the prior year relative to the adoption or modification of standards pursuant to Section 348. (3) The results of each review of a major outage undertaken by the Independent System Operator pursuant to Section 349.