|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 5105.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6936.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6435.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 3785.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3676.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. (June 2 amended measure version corrected June 10.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3184.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|