LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1460
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1460
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1460
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 19, 2010
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 2, 2010
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 20, 2010
Compare
Bill
August 16, 2010
Compare
Bill
June 2, 2010
Compare
Bill
April 21, 2010
Compare