|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 6245.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 6170.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Placed on third reading. (Ayes 43. Noes 24. Page 6053.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 3739.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3676.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3306.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|