California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1474 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2010

Amended

Bill August 12, 2010
Bill August 5, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010