|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 295, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4945.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6303.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6304.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6236.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3277.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3164.)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after April 2.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|