California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1478 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2010

Amended

Bill August 16, 2010
Bill June 14, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010