|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 2218.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2762.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1108.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 420.)
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|