California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill July 7, 2009
Bill May 20, 2009
Bill April 14, 2009