|
08/31/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6427.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1137.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 707.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|