LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB165
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB165
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB165
Compare Versions
SB165 Amended August 20, 2010
SB165 Amended June 22, 2010
SB165 Amended June 23, 2009
SB165 Amended May 26, 2009
SB165 Amended April 14, 2009
SB165 Introduced February 14, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB165 Amended August 20, 2010
SB165 Amended June 22, 2010
SB165 Amended June 23, 2009
SB165 Amended May 26, 2009
SB165 Amended April 14, 2009
SB165 Introduced February 14, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare