|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 2217.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2860.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1177.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1068.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 729.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 582.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|