LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB173
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB173
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB173
Compare Versions
SB173 Enrolled September 8, 2009
SB173 Amended July 6, 2009
SB173 Amended June 1, 2009
SB173 Amended May 6, 2009
SB173 Amended April 20, 2009
SB173 Introduced February 14, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB173 Enrolled September 8, 2009
SB173 Amended July 6, 2009
SB173 Amended June 1, 2009
SB173 Amended May 6, 2009
SB173 Amended April 20, 2009
SB173 Introduced February 14, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare