|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 564, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2274.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2938.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2825.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1188.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 680.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|