LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB178
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB178
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB178
Compare Versions
SB178 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB178 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB178 Amended August 31, 2009
SB178 Amended July 23, 2009
SB178 Amended May 21, 2009
SB178 Introduced February 17, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB178 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB178 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB178 Amended August 31, 2009
SB178 Amended July 23, 2009
SB178 Amended May 21, 2009
SB178 Introduced February 17, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare