|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2479.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 900.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 703.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|