LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB18
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB18
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB18
Compare Versions
SB18 Chaptered August 6, 2009
SB18 Enrolled July 14, 2009
SB18 Amended May 5, 2009
SB18 Amended April 13, 2009
SB18 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
SB18 Chaptered August 6, 2009
SB18 Enrolled July 14, 2009
SB18 Amended May 5, 2009
SB18 Amended April 13, 2009
SB18 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare