02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/07/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/05/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/16/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on EQ. | |||
02/18/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |