|
09/27/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 5005.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 6755.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2727.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected May 20.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 703.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Corrected April 24.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|