California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 15, 2010
Bill January 7, 2010
Bill May 18, 2009
Bill May 5, 2009
Bill April 22, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009