|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2285.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2885.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2827.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 795.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 480.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|