LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB197
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB197
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB197
Compare Versions
SB197 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB197 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB197 Amended August 31, 2009
SB197 Amended July 15, 2009
SB197 Amended April 30, 2009
SB197 Amended April 23, 2009
SB197 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB197 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB197 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB197 Amended August 31, 2009
SB197 Amended July 15, 2009
SB197 Amended April 30, 2009
SB197 Amended April 23, 2009
SB197 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare