08/06/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/05/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
07/13/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/13/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2480.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2009 | Action rescinded and record expunged whereby bill read third time and a roll call taken. From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |||
06/18/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/17/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 17.) | |||
05/28/2009 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 901.) To Assembly. | |||
05/11/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/07/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 809.) | |||
04/29/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/16/2009 | Set for hearing May 6. | |||
02/24/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |