LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB198
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB198
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB198
Compare Versions
SB198 Chaptered August 6, 2009
SB198 Enrolled July 14, 2009
SB198 Amended April 29, 2009
SB198 Amended April 13, 2009
SB198 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB198 Chaptered August 6, 2009
SB198 Enrolled July 14, 2009
SB198 Amended April 29, 2009
SB198 Amended April 13, 2009
SB198 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare