|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 325, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2914.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1103.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1066.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 581.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|