LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB2
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB2
Compare Versions
SB2 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB2 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB2 Amended May 20, 2009
SB2 Amended May 13, 2009
SB2 Amended March 19, 2009
SB2 Amended February 24, 2009
SB2 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
SB2 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB2 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB2 Amended May 20, 2009
SB2 Amended May 13, 2009
SB2 Amended March 19, 2009
SB2 Amended February 24, 2009
SB2 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare