|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 621, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4948.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Set for hearing August 23. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4806.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4565.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6234.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6173.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on May 28.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 5253.) Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Ma.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 925.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 848.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 675.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|