LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB202
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB202
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB202
Compare Versions
SB202 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB202 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB202 Amended August 12, 2010
SB202 Amended June 17, 2010
SB202 Amended May 20, 2010
SB202 Amended July 1, 2009
SB202 Amended June 15, 2009
SB202 Amended May 14, 2009
SB202 Amended May 5, 2009
SB202 Amended April 22, 2009
SB202 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB202 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB202 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB202 Amended August 12, 2010
SB202 Amended June 17, 2010
SB202 Amended May 20, 2010
SB202 Amended July 1, 2009
SB202 Amended June 15, 2009
SB202 Amended May 14, 2009
SB202 Amended May 5, 2009
SB202 Amended April 22, 2009
SB202 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare