|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 568, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2336.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 2352.)
|
|
|
|
09/05/2009
|
Set for hearing September 8.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2885.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2757.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 793.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 655.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 556.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|