LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB204
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB204
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB204
Compare Versions
SB204 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB204 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB204 Amended September 2, 2009
SB204 Amended August 27, 2009
SB204 Amended June 8, 2009
SB204 Amended April 20, 2009
SB204 Amended April 13, 2009
SB204 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB204 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB204 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB204 Amended September 2, 2009
SB204 Amended August 27, 2009
SB204 Amended June 8, 2009
SB204 Amended April 20, 2009
SB204 Amended April 13, 2009
SB204 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare